John Chiste
Direktor/Vorstandsmitglied bei SOLITRON DEVICES, INC.
Vermögen: 108 840 $ am 31.05.2024
Aktive Positionen von John Chiste
Unternehmen | Position | Beginn | Ende |
---|---|---|---|
SOLITRON DEVICES, INC. | Direktor/Vorstandsmitglied | 12.01.2015 | - |
Independent Dir/Board Member | 12.01.2015 | - |
Karriereverlauf von John Chiste
Ehemalige bekannte Positionen von John Chiste
Unternehmen | Position | Beginn | Ende |
---|---|---|---|
ZEO SCIENTIFIX, INC. | Direktor/Vorstandsmitglied | 23.09.2022 | 21.12.2022 |
Independent Dir/Board Member | 23.09.2022 | 21.12.2022 | |
FORWARD INDUSTRIES, INC. | Direktor/Vorstandsmitglied | 04.11.2009 | 05.01.2015 |
Independent Dir/Board Member | 01.02.2008 | 05.01.2015 | |
BLUEGREEN VACATIONS CORPORATION | Finanzdirektor/CFO | 15.04.2005 | 15.04.2005 |
Treasurer | 15.04.2005 | 15.04.2005 | |
Computer Integration Corp
Computer Integration Corp Electronics DistributorsDistribution Services Part of Compucom Systems, Inc., Computer Integration Corp is a company that resells microcomputers. The company is based in Charlotte, NC. Computer Integration was acquired by Compucom Systems, Inc. on May 13, 1998 for $12.91 million. | Finanzdirektor/CFO | 01.01.1997 | 01.01.1997 |
Unternehmenssekretär | 01.01.1997 | 01.01.1997 | |
Treasurer | 01.01.1997 | 01.01.1997 | |
Ernst & Young LLP
Ernst & Young LLP Miscellaneous Commercial ServicesCommercial Services Ernst & Young LLP engages in the provision of accounting, assurance, tax, transaction, and advisory services. It specializes in the actuarial, analytics and big data, cyber security, accounting compliance and reporting, center for board matters, international financial reporting standards, country tax advisory, global trade, tax accounting, and climate change and sustainability. The company was founded in 1989 and is headquartered in New York, NY. | Corporate Officer/Principal | 01.01.1983 | 01.01.1992 |
Ausbildung von John Chiste
Florida Atlantic University | Undergraduate Degree |
Statistik
International
Vereinigte Staaten | 8 |
Operativ
Director of Finance/CFO | 7 |
Director/Board Member | 3 |
Independent Dir/Board Member | 3 |
Sektoral
Electronic Technology | 2 |
Distribution Services | 2 |
Finance | 2 |
Besetzte Positionen
Aktive
Inaktive
Börsennotierte Unternehmen
Private Unternehmen
Unternehmensverbindungen
Börsennotierte Unternehmen | 3 |
---|---|
SOLITRON DEVICES, INC. | Electronic Technology |
FORWARD INDUSTRIES, INC. | Consumer Durables |
ZEO SCIENTIFIX, INC. | Health Technology |
Private Unternehmen | 3 |
---|---|
Computer Integration Corp
Computer Integration Corp Electronics DistributorsDistribution Services Part of Compucom Systems, Inc., Computer Integration Corp is a company that resells microcomputers. The company is based in Charlotte, NC. Computer Integration was acquired by Compucom Systems, Inc. on May 13, 1998 for $12.91 million. | Distribution Services |
Bluegreen Vacations Corp.
Bluegreen Vacations Corp. Real Estate DevelopmentFinance Bluegreen Vacations Corp. is a vacation ownership company, which markets and sells vacation ownership interests (VOIs) and manages resorts in leisure and urban destinations. Its resort network includes 42 Club, and 24 Club Associate. The firm operates through the following segments: Sales of VOIs & Financing, and Resort Operations & Club Management. The Sales of VOIs & Financing segment markets and sells VOIs that it owns; also sells VOIs through fee-for-service agreements with third-party developers; and provides consumer financing. The Resort Operations & Club Management segment provides management services to the Bluegreen Vacation Club and to a majority of the HOAs of the resorts. This segment also manages the club reservation services, provides services to owners and performs billing and collections services. The company was founded in 1966 and is headquartered in Boca Raton, FL. | Finance |
Ernst & Young LLP
Ernst & Young LLP Miscellaneous Commercial ServicesCommercial Services Ernst & Young LLP engages in the provision of accounting, assurance, tax, transaction, and advisory services. It specializes in the actuarial, analytics and big data, cyber security, accounting compliance and reporting, center for board matters, international financial reporting standards, country tax advisory, global trade, tax accounting, and climate change and sustainability. The company was founded in 1989 and is headquartered in New York, NY. | Commercial Services |
- Börse
- Insiders
- John Chiste
- Erfahrung