Peter Ironside
Direktor/Vorstandsmitglied bei E79 GOLD MINES LIMITED
Vermögen: 1 Mio $ am 31.05.2024
Aktive Positionen von Peter Ironside
Unternehmen | Position | Beginn | Ende |
---|---|---|---|
ADX ENERGY LTD | Unternehmenssekretär | 08.03.1995 | - |
STAVELY MINERALS LIMITED | Direktor/Vorstandsmitglied | 23.05.2006 | - |
E79 GOLD MINES LIMITED | Direktor/Vorstandsmitglied | 05.04.2007 | - |
Ausvaal Pty Ltd. | Direktor/Vorstandsmitglied | 07.01.2011 | - |
Ironside Pty Ltd. | Direktor/Vorstandsmitglied | 27.01.2011 | - |
Rembu Pty Ltd. | Direktor/Vorstandsmitglied | - | - |
Karriereverlauf von Peter Ironside
Ehemalige bekannte Positionen von Peter Ironside
Unternehmen | Position | Beginn | Ende |
---|---|---|---|
Atticus Resources Ltd.
Atticus Resources Ltd. Precious MetalsNon-Energy Minerals Atticus Resources Ltd. engages in the exploration of gold. It has beneficial interests in two gold exploration projects located in the Northern part of the Eastern Gold fields province of the Yilgarn Craton, Western Australia. The Hartwell Bore project is 100% owned by APG resources, a wholly owned subsidiary of the company, and the Yundamindera project. The company was founded on April 5, 2007 and is headquartered in Nedlands, Australia. | Direktor/Vorstandsmitglied | 17.03.2011 | 22.04.2013 |
Independent Dir/Board Member | 17.03.2011 | 22.04.2013 | |
Unternehmenssekretär | 20.10.2009 | 22.04.2013 | |
Silver Lake (Integra) Pty Ltd.
Silver Lake (Integra) Pty Ltd. Precious MetalsNon-Energy Minerals Silver Lake (Integra) Pty Ltd. operates as an exploration company with a portfolio of gold, nickel, copper, zinc sulphides, platinum group elements, and uranium. Its projects include Aldiss gold, Randalls gold, Mt Monger gold, Cowarna, Glandore Erayinia and Queen Lapage Projects. The company was founded on June 13, 2000 and is headquartered in Nedlands, Australia. | Direktor/Vorstandsmitglied | 07.01.2011 | 26.10.2012 |
Finanzdirektor/CFO | 26.10.2012 | 01.01.2013 | |
Unternehmenssekretär | 21.12.2000 | 26.10.2012 | |
BacTech Mining Corp.
BacTech Mining Corp. Precious MetalsNon-Energy Minerals BacTech Mining Corp. owns proprietary bacterial oxidation technology that liberates precious and base metals from difficult to treat sulphide ores and concentrates. Bacterial oxidation is a safe and environmentally friendly process. It plans to identify projects with difficult metallurgy. BacTech will also entertain a conventional licensing transaction, should equity in the project be unavailable. The company was founded in 1988 and is headquartered in Toronto, Canada | Direktor/Vorstandsmitglied | - | 08.02.2007 |
░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░ ░░░ ░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ | - | - |
░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░ | - | - | |
░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░ ░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ | - |
░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ | - | |
░░░ ░░░░░ ░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ | - |
░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ | - |
Statistik
International
Australien | 12 |
Kanada | 2 |
Operativ
Director/Board Member | 10 |
Corporate Secretary | 6 |
Director of Finance/CFO | 1 |
Sektoral
Non-Energy Minerals | 8 |
Technology Services | 2 |
Energy Minerals | 2 |
Besetzte Positionen
Aktive
Inaktive
Börsennotierte Unternehmen
Private Unternehmen
Unternehmensverbindungen
Börsennotierte Unternehmen | 3 |
---|---|
ADX ENERGY LTD | Energy Minerals |
STAVELY MINERALS LIMITED | Non-Energy Minerals |
E79 GOLD MINES LIMITED | Non-Energy Minerals |
Private Unternehmen | 9 |
---|---|
BacTech Mining Corp.
BacTech Mining Corp. Precious MetalsNon-Energy Minerals BacTech Mining Corp. owns proprietary bacterial oxidation technology that liberates precious and base metals from difficult to treat sulphide ores and concentrates. Bacterial oxidation is a safe and environmentally friendly process. It plans to identify projects with difficult metallurgy. BacTech will also entertain a conventional licensing transaction, should equity in the project be unavailable. The company was founded in 1988 and is headquartered in Toronto, Canada | Non-Energy Minerals |
Silver Lake (Integra) Pty Ltd.
Silver Lake (Integra) Pty Ltd. Precious MetalsNon-Energy Minerals Silver Lake (Integra) Pty Ltd. operates as an exploration company with a portfolio of gold, nickel, copper, zinc sulphides, platinum group elements, and uranium. Its projects include Aldiss gold, Randalls gold, Mt Monger gold, Cowarna, Glandore Erayinia and Queen Lapage Projects. The company was founded on June 13, 2000 and is headquartered in Nedlands, Australia. | Non-Energy Minerals |
ASG Group Ltd.
ASG Group Ltd. Information Technology ServicesTechnology Services ASG Group Ltd. provides information technology business solutions and services. It offers consulting, professional and managed services, hosted, and cloud services. The firm's services are used to deliver solutions across a wide range of technologies including business intelligence, core business applications, middleware, technical, and hardware infrastructure. The company was founded by Geoffrey James Lewis and Stephen Tull in 1996 and is headquartered in Perth, Australia. | Technology Services |
Atticus Resources Ltd.
Atticus Resources Ltd. Precious MetalsNon-Energy Minerals Atticus Resources Ltd. engages in the exploration of gold. It has beneficial interests in two gold exploration projects located in the Northern part of the Eastern Gold fields province of the Yilgarn Craton, Western Australia. The Hartwell Bore project is 100% owned by APG resources, a wholly owned subsidiary of the company, and the Yundamindera project. The company was founded on April 5, 2007 and is headquartered in Nedlands, Australia. | Non-Energy Minerals |
Ausvaal Pty Ltd. | |
Ironside Pty Ltd. | |
Zamanco Minerals Ltd.
Zamanco Minerals Ltd. Other Metals/MineralsNon-Energy Minerals Zamanco Minerals Ltd. engages in the mineral exploration and associated studies for manganese in Zambia. The company was founded on April 5, 2007 and is headquartered in Nedlands, Australia. | Non-Energy Minerals |
Extract Resources Pty Ltd.
Extract Resources Pty Ltd. Other Metals/MineralsNon-Energy Minerals Extract Resources Ltd. explores, develops and mines for uranium. The company was founded on January 9, 1992 and is headquartered in West Perth, Australia. | Non-Energy Minerals |
Rembu Pty Ltd. |
- Börse
- Insiders
- Peter Ironside
- Erfahrung