Karen Ho Hong
Direktor/Vorstandsmitglied bei BioRexis Pharmaceutical Corp.
Aktive Positionen von Karen Ho Hong
Unternehmen | Position | Beginn | Ende |
---|---|---|---|
BioRexis Pharmaceutical Corp.
BioRexis Pharmaceutical Corp. Pharmaceuticals: MajorHealth Technology BioRexis Pharmaceutical Corp. provides novel protein and peptide drugs with pharmacology and trans-bodies to replace conventional monoclonal antibodies. The company was founded by Christopher P. Prior, Andrew Turner and David R. King in 2002 and is headquartered in Rosemont, PA. | Direktor/Vorstandsmitglied | - | - |
Novo Ventures (US), Inc.
Novo Ventures (US), Inc. Investment ManagersFinance Novo Ventures (US), Inc. is a venture capital firm located in San Francisco. The firm is a subsidiary of Novo A/S and their ultimate parent is Novo Nordisk Fonden. | Private Equity Investor | 01.04.2019 | - |
StrideBio, Inc.
StrideBio, Inc. BiotechnologyHealth Technology Stridebio, Inc. focuses on creating and developing novel adeno-associated viral vector technologies. The company was founded by Aravind Asokan, Mavis Agbandje-McKenna and Patrick Ritschel and is headquartered in Durham, NC. | Direktor/Vorstandsmitglied | - | - |
Novo Holdings A/S (Investment Company)
Novo Holdings A/S (Investment Company) Financial ConglomeratesFinance Novo Holdings A/S (Investment Company) (Novo Holdings-IC) is the investment portfolio division of Novo Holdings A/S, a holding company headquartered in Hellerup, Denmark. They are ultimately owned by Novo Nordisk Fonden (Novo Nordisk Foundation). Founded in 1999, Novo Holdings-IC manages a broad portfolio of the Foundation’s financial assets. | Private Equity Investor | 01.04.2019 | - |
Karriereverlauf von Karen Ho Hong
Ehemalige bekannte Positionen von Karen Ho Hong
Unternehmen | Position | Beginn | Ende |
---|---|---|---|
CYTEIR THERAPEUTICS, INC. | Direktor/Vorstandsmitglied | 01.10.2019 | 15.12.2021 |
Independent Dir/Board Member | 01.10.2019 | 15.12.2021 | |
AGILE THERAPEUTICS, INC. | Direktor/Vorstandsmitglied | 01.05.2006 | 28.07.2016 |
Independent Dir/Board Member | 19.03.2014 | 28.07.2016 | |
ProQuest Management LLC
ProQuest Management LLC Investment ManagersFinance ProQuest Management LLC (ProQuest Management) is a venture capital firm founded in 1998 by Jay Moorin. The firm headquartered in Naples, Florida. | Private Equity Investor | 01.07.2001 | 31.05.2016 |
BancBoston Capital, Inc.
BancBoston Capital, Inc. Investment ManagersFinance Founded in 2004, BancBoston Capital, Inc. is a private equity/venture capital firm located in Boston, Massachusetts. They are a subsidiary of Bank of America NA and their ultimate parent is Bank of America Corp. (NYSE: BAC). | Corporate Officer/Principal | - | 31.12.2000 |
Takeda Ventures, Inc.
Takeda Ventures, Inc. Investment ManagersFinance Takeda Ventures Inc (Takeda Ventures) is a venture capital subsidiary of Takeda America Holdings Inc founded in 2001. The firm is headquartered in Palo Alto, California. | Private Equity Investor | 01.06.2017 | - |
░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ | - |
░░░░░ ░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ | - | - |
░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ | - |
░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ | - |
░░░ ░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ | - | ░░░░░░░░░░ |
░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ | - |
Ausbildung von Karen Ho Hong
University of California, Berkeley | Undergraduate Degree |
Massachusetts Institute of Technology | Doctorate Degree |
Statistik
International
Vereinigte Staaten | 14 |
Kanada | 2 |
Israel | 2 |
Operativ
Director/Board Member | 8 |
Private Equity Investor | 5 |
Independent Dir/Board Member | 2 |
Sektoral
Finance | 8 |
Health Technology | 8 |
Consumer Services | 2 |
Besetzte Positionen
Aktive
Inaktive
Börsennotierte Unternehmen
Private Unternehmen
Unternehmensverbindungen
Börsennotierte Unternehmen | 2 |
---|---|
AGILE THERAPEUTICS, INC. | Health Technology |
BIOSYNTECH, INC. | Health Technology |
Private Unternehmen | 12 |
---|---|
ProQuest Management LLC
ProQuest Management LLC Investment ManagersFinance ProQuest Management LLC (ProQuest Management) is a venture capital firm founded in 1998 by Jay Moorin. The firm headquartered in Naples, Florida. | Finance |
Ben Franklin Technology Partners /Ventures/
Ben Franklin Technology Partners /Ventures/ Investment ManagersFinance Ben Franklin Technology Partners /Ventures/ (Ben Franklin Tech Partners) is a venture Capital firm founded in 1982. The firm is headquartered in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania. | Finance |
BancBoston Capital, Inc.
BancBoston Capital, Inc. Investment ManagersFinance Founded in 2004, BancBoston Capital, Inc. is a private equity/venture capital firm located in Boston, Massachusetts. They are a subsidiary of Bank of America NA and their ultimate parent is Bank of America Corp. (NYSE: BAC). | Finance |
BioRexis Pharmaceutical Corp.
BioRexis Pharmaceutical Corp. Pharmaceuticals: MajorHealth Technology BioRexis Pharmaceutical Corp. provides novel protein and peptide drugs with pharmacology and trans-bodies to replace conventional monoclonal antibodies. The company was founded by Christopher P. Prior, Andrew Turner and David R. King in 2002 and is headquartered in Rosemont, PA. | Health Technology |
Clarus Therapeutics, Inc.
Clarus Therapeutics, Inc. Pharmaceuticals: MajorHealth Technology Clarus Therapeutics, Inc. operated as a men's health specialty pharmaceutical company that focuses on the development and commercialization of oral testosterone replacement therapy. It offered JATENZO, a soft gel oral formulation of testosterone undecanoate for treating hypogonadal men. The company was founded by Robert E. Dudley in February 2004 and was headquartered in Northbrook, IL. | Health Technology |
BiomX Ltd.
BiomX Ltd. Pharmaceuticals: MajorHealth Technology BiomX Ltd. engages in the development of customized phage therapies designed to target and destroy harmful bacteria in chronic diseases such as inflammatory bowel disease and colorectalcancer, as well as bacteria that affect the appearance of the skin. The company was founded by Eran Elinav, Timothy K. Lu, and Rotem Sorek on March 3, 2015 and is headquartered in Ness Ziona, Israel. | Health Technology |
Palleon Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Palleon Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Miscellaneous Commercial ServicesCommercial Services Palleon Pharmaceuticals, Inc. operates as biotechnology company. The firm discovers and develops immuno-oncology drugs, medicines, and therapies for the treatment of cancer diseases. It specializes in clinical development, and glyco-immune checkpoint inhibitors. The company was founded by Jim Broderick, Carolyn Bertozzi and Paul Crocker in 2015 and is headquartered in Waltham, MA. | Commercial Services |
Takeda Ventures, Inc.
Takeda Ventures, Inc. Investment ManagersFinance Takeda Ventures Inc (Takeda Ventures) is a venture capital subsidiary of Takeda America Holdings Inc founded in 2001. The firm is headquartered in Palo Alto, California. | Finance |
Novo Ventures (US), Inc.
Novo Ventures (US), Inc. Investment ManagersFinance Novo Ventures (US), Inc. is a venture capital firm located in San Francisco. The firm is a subsidiary of Novo A/S and their ultimate parent is Novo Nordisk Fonden. | Finance |
Cyteir Therapeutics, Inc.
Cyteir Therapeutics, Inc. BiotechnologyHealth Technology Cyteir Therapeutics, Inc.is a clinical-stage biotechnology company, develops and commercializes the next-generation of precision oncology medicines. Its lead product CYT-0851, a novel, oral, once-daily, small molecule drug candidate that is in Phase I/II clinical trial for monotherapy in solid tumors and hematologic malignancies, as well as for combination therapy in solid tumors and hematologic malignancies. The company was founded by Kevin Mills and Timothy Romberger in June 2012 and is headquartered in Lexington, MA. | Health Technology |
StrideBio, Inc.
StrideBio, Inc. BiotechnologyHealth Technology Stridebio, Inc. focuses on creating and developing novel adeno-associated viral vector technologies. The company was founded by Aravind Asokan, Mavis Agbandje-McKenna and Patrick Ritschel and is headquartered in Durham, NC. | Health Technology |
Novo Holdings A/S (Investment Company)
Novo Holdings A/S (Investment Company) Financial ConglomeratesFinance Novo Holdings A/S (Investment Company) (Novo Holdings-IC) is the investment portfolio division of Novo Holdings A/S, a holding company headquartered in Hellerup, Denmark. They are ultimately owned by Novo Nordisk Fonden (Novo Nordisk Foundation). Founded in 1999, Novo Holdings-IC manages a broad portfolio of the Foundation’s financial assets. | Finance |
- Börse
- Insiders
- Karen Ho Hong
- Erfahrung