Jenny Johnson
Chief Executive Officer bei FRANKLIN RESOURCES, INC.
Vermögen: 164 Mio $ am 31.03.2024
Profil
Jennifer M. Johnson ist President, Chief Executive Officer, COO & Director bei Franklin Resources, Inc. und Chief Investment Officer bei Brandywine Group Trust - Global Fixed Income Fund (eine Tochtergesellschaft von Franklin Resources, Inc.). Sie ist außerdem im Vorstand von Vantage Corp. Ltd., des Lucile Salter Packard Children's Hospital in Stanford und der Crystal Springs Uplands School. Jennifer M. Johnson war zuvor Chief Executive Officer-Finance & Administration bei Templeton Global Income Fund, Beraterin bei Rigel Associates LLC, Vorsitzende von Franklin Capital Corp., Vorsitzende von Franklin Templeton Bank & Trust, FSB, Direktorin bei The Shelter Network of San Mateo County und Direktorin bei Juvenile Diabetes Research Foundation Ltd. Jennifer M. Johnson erwarb einen Bachelor-Abschluss an der University of California, Davis.
Bekannte Unternehmensbeteiligungen
Unternehmen | Datum | Anzahl der Aktien | Bewertung | Datum der Bewertung |
---|---|---|---|---|
FRANKLIN RESOURCES, INC.
1,11% | 12.12.2023 | 5 849 114 ( 1,11% ) | 164 Mio $ | 31.03.2024 |
30.03.2024 | 0 ( -.--% ) | - $ | 31.03.2024 |
Aktive Positionen von Jenny Johnson
Unternehmen | Position | Beginn |
---|---|---|
FRANKLIN RESOURCES, INC. | Chief Executive Officer | 11.02.2020 |
THERMO FISHER SCIENTIFIC | Director/Board Member | 13.07.2023 |
Shatter Fund LLC
Shatter Fund LLC Investment ManagersFinance Shatter Fund LLC(Shatter Fund) is a venture capital firm founded in 2016 by Shelly Kapoor Collins in 2016. The firm is headquartered in Danville. | Consultant / Advisor | - |
Franklin Templeton Trust
Franklin Templeton Trust Investment Trusts/Mutual FundsMiscellaneous Franklin Templeton Trust is an open-end investment company, which engages in the investment in U.S. government securities, repurchase agreements, and portfolio maturity and quality. The company was founded on August 2, 2019 and is headquartered in San Mateo, CA. | Chairman | 01.01.2020 |
Brandywine Group Trust - Global Fixed Income Fund | Chief Investment Officer | - |
Lucile Salter Packard Children's Hospital at Stanford
Lucile Salter Packard Children's Hospital at Stanford Hospital/Nursing ManagementHealth Services Lucile Salter Packard Children''s Hospital at Stanford engages in the provision of hospital services. It focuses on the obstetric and pediatric areas: brain and behavior, cancer, heart, pregnancy and newborn, pulmonary, and transplant. Its practices and services include anesthesia, cancer and blood diseases, cardiology, cardiovascular intensive care, dialysis, labor and delivery, neonatology, perinatal diagnostic center, pharmacy services, pulmonary function laboratory, radiology, rehabilitation services, social services, speech and language, and before and after surgical care. The company was founded in 1991 and is headquartered in Palo Alto, CA. | Director/Board Member | 01.09.2015 |
Crystal Springs Uplands School | Director/Board Member | - |
Vantage Corp. Ltd.
Vantage Corp. Ltd. Financial ConglomeratesFinance Vantage Corp. Ltd. operates as an investment holding company. It engages in the investment of marketable securities and trademark agency operations. The company is headquartered in Singapore. | Director/Board Member | - |
Ehemalige bekannte Positionen von Jenny Johnson
Unternehmen | Position | Ende |
---|---|---|
TEMPLETON GLOBAL GROWTH FUND LTD. | Director/Board Member | 22.02.2017 |
░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░ ░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ |
░░░░ ░░ ░░░ ░░░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ |
░░░ ░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ ░░ ░░░ ░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ |
░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░░ ░░░░ ░░░░░ ░░░░░░ ░░░ | ░░░░░░░░ | - |
Ausbildung von Jenny Johnson
University of California, Davis | Undergraduate Degree |
Erfahrungen
Besetzte Positionen
Aktive
Inaktive
Börsennotierte Unternehmen
Private Unternehmen
Beziehungen
Beziehungen ersten Grades
Unternehmen ersten Grades
Herr
Frau
Aufsichtsräte
Führungskräfte
Unternehmensverbindungen
Börsennotierte Unternehmen | 2 |
---|---|
FRANKLIN RESOURCES, INC. | Finance |
THERMO FISHER SCIENTIFIC | Health Technology |
Private Unternehmen | 18 |
---|---|
Saba Capital Income & Opportunities Fund II
Saba Capital Income & Opportunities Fund II Investment Trusts/Mutual FundsMiscellaneous Saba Capital Income & Opportunities Fund II operates as a closed-end Investment Fund. Its portfolio includes debt and income producing securities. The company was founded on March 17, 1998 and is headquartered in Fort Lauderdale, FL. | Miscellaneous |
Fiduciary Trust Company International
Fiduciary Trust Company International Investment ManagersFinance Fiduciary Trust Co. International is an investment and wealth management firm headquartered in New York City. The firm is an indirectly-owned subsidiary of Franklin Resources, Inc. (NYSE: BEN), a holding company that, together with its various subsidiaries, is referred to as Franklin Templeton Investments. Franklin Templeton Investments is a global investment management organization offering investment services under the a global investment management organization offering investment services under the Franklin, Templeton, Mutual Series, Bissett, Fiduciary Trust, Darby, Balanced Equity Management and K2 brand names. Franklin Templeton Investments, through current and predecessor subsidiaries, has been engaged in the investment management and related services business since 1947. Fiduciary Trust was founded in 1931 and provides personalized investment solutions to high net-worth individuals, families, endowments, foundations and institutions. | Finance |
Keynote Systems, Inc.
Keynote Systems, Inc. Packaged SoftwareTechnology Services Keynote Systems, Inc. engages in the provision of cloud-based solutions for mobile application. The company was founded by Jim Barrick and Andrew Popell in 1995 and is headquartered in San Mateo, CA. | Technology Services |
Franklin Capital Corp. | Miscellaneous |
Rigel Associates LLC
Rigel Associates LLC Investment ManagersFinance Rigel Associates LLC (Rigel Associates) is a private equity firm co-founded by Michael A. Mitgang and Rob H. Robinson in 2002. The firm is headquartered in San Mateo, California. | Finance |
Templeton Global Growth Fund Ltd.
Templeton Global Growth Fund Ltd. Investment Trusts/Mutual FundsMiscellaneous Templeton Global Growth Fund Ltd. Is a closed-end investment fund, which investment objective is to achieve long term capital growth from a globally diversified portfolio of investment securities. It invest primarily in the international securities. The company was founded in May 1987 and is headquartered in Melbourne, Australia. | Miscellaneous |
Vantage Corp. Ltd.
Vantage Corp. Ltd. Financial ConglomeratesFinance Vantage Corp. Ltd. operates as an investment holding company. It engages in the investment of marketable securities and trademark agency operations. The company is headquartered in Singapore. | Finance |
Lucile Salter Packard Children's Hospital at Stanford
Lucile Salter Packard Children's Hospital at Stanford Hospital/Nursing ManagementHealth Services Lucile Salter Packard Children''s Hospital at Stanford engages in the provision of hospital services. It focuses on the obstetric and pediatric areas: brain and behavior, cancer, heart, pregnancy and newborn, pulmonary, and transplant. Its practices and services include anesthesia, cancer and blood diseases, cardiology, cardiovascular intensive care, dialysis, labor and delivery, neonatology, perinatal diagnostic center, pharmacy services, pulmonary function laboratory, radiology, rehabilitation services, social services, speech and language, and before and after surgical care. The company was founded in 1991 and is headquartered in Palo Alto, CA. | Health Services |
Riva Financial Systems Ltd.
Riva Financial Systems Ltd. Packaged SoftwareTechnology Services Riva Financial Systems Ltd. provides software solutions to the asset management. It provides support services, such as project planning and management, business gap analysis, enhancements/interface development, model office, data migration and conversion mapping, and training. The company was founded in October 2002 and is headquartered in Douglas, the United Kingdom. | Technology Services |
Franklin Templeton Bank & Trust, FSB
Franklin Templeton Bank & Trust, FSB Savings BanksFinance Franklin Templeton Bank & Trust, FSB is a federally chartered savings bank. The company is based in Salt Lake City, UT. | Finance |
The Volunteer Center of San Francisco, Inc.
The Volunteer Center of San Francisco, Inc. Miscellaneous Commercial ServicesCommercial Services The Volunteer Center of San Francisco, Inc. operates as a non-profit organization. The firm offers resources, consulting and training services. It connects individuals, nonprofits and businesses with opportunities and resources needed to support local communities. The company was founded in 1946 and is headquartered in San Francisco, CA. | Commercial Services |
YMCA of San Francisco | |
Crystal Springs Uplands School | |
The Shelter Network of San Mateo County
The Shelter Network of San Mateo County Medical/Nursing ServicesHealth Services The Shelter Network of San Mateo County provided housing and support services to homeless families and individuals. The company was headquartered in Burlingame, CA. | Health Services |
Juvenile Diabetes Research Foundation Ltd.
Juvenile Diabetes Research Foundation Ltd. Miscellaneous Commercial ServicesCommercial Services Juvenile Diabetes Research Foundation Ltd. is a British company that engages in the prevention, treatment, causes, and cure for diabetes. The CEO of the non-profit company is Karen Addington. | Commercial Services |
Brandywine Group Trust - Global Fixed Income Fund | Miscellaneous |
Shatter Fund LLC
Shatter Fund LLC Investment ManagersFinance Shatter Fund LLC(Shatter Fund) is a venture capital firm founded in 2016 by Shelly Kapoor Collins in 2016. The firm is headquartered in Danville. | Finance |
Franklin Templeton Trust
Franklin Templeton Trust Investment Trusts/Mutual FundsMiscellaneous Franklin Templeton Trust is an open-end investment company, which engages in the investment in U.S. government securities, repurchase agreements, and portfolio maturity and quality. The company was founded on August 2, 2019 and is headquartered in San Mateo, CA. | Miscellaneous |